EP1480387 - Source routing protocol for an ad-hoc communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [2008/42] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gutierrez, Jose A. 13345 West Bureigh Road Apt. 8 Brookfield WI 53005 / US | 02 /
Pereira, Luis R. 5016 N 83 Street Milwaukee WI 53218 / US | [2008/20] |
Former [2004/48] | 01 /
Gutierrez, Jose A. 13345 West Burleigh Road Apt. 8 Brookfield WI 53005 / US | ||
02 /
Pereira, Luis R. 5016 N 83 Street Milwaukee WI 53218 / US | Representative(s) | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Emde, Eric Wagner & Geyer, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009883.2 | 26.04.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | US20030441315 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: US 441315 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1480387 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480387 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L45/34 (EP,US);
H04W40/12 (EP,US);
H04W40/246 (EP,US);
H04W40/248 (EP,US);
H04W40/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2005/33] |
Former [2004/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Quellen-Leitweglenkungsprotokoll für ein Ad-hoc-Kommunikationsnetz | [2008/20] | English: | Source routing protocol for an ad-hoc communication network | [2004/48] | French: | Protocol de routage depuis la source pour un réseau de communication ad-hoc | [2004/48] |
Former [2004/48] | Quellen-Leitweglenkungsprotocoll für ein Ad-hoc-Kommunikationsnetz | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 17.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.02.2008 | 15.02.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0282198 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 1-41 * column 5, line 30 - column 5, line 36 * * column 7, line 14 - column 7, line 29 * * column 11, line 33 - column 13, line 39 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1271855 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB]) [X] 1-41 * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0027] - [0032] - [0036] - [0041] - [0051] - [0055] - [0072] - [0084] * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO03015452 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-41* paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0034] - [0037] *; | [A] - GUTIERREZ, J.A. ET AL, "IEEE 802.15.4: Developing Standard for Low-Power Low-Cost Wireless Personal Area Networks", IEEE NETWORK, vol. 15, (200109), pages 12 - 19, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/xpl/abs_free.jsp?arNumber=953229, (20040811), XP002292031 [A] 1-41 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.953229 |