15.02.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
09.03.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
30.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] |
18.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.02.2009 |
First examination report |
|
21.02.2008 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
22.02.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.07.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
22.07.2005 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2005 [2005/36] |
03.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
07.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|