Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
05.10.2007 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
03.10.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
03.10.2007 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
28.09.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
03.08.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
16.05.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
03.05.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.06.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
02.06.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] |
29.04.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.09.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
26.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant |