Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1591327 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2007 | B1 | EP1591327 | 02.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04010030 | 28.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004009891T | 28.08.2008 | T2 | DE602004009891D1 | 20.12.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04010030 | 28.04.2004 |