EP1472993 - Dual guide-wire medical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa CA 95403 / US | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states Medtronic Vascular, Inc. 3576 Unocal Place Santa Rosa, California 95403 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goshgarian, Justin G. 2030 Knolls Drive Santa Rosa California 95405 / US | [2004/45] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/45] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04010118.0 | 28.04.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | US20030427351 | 30.04.2003 Original published format: US 427351 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1472993 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
A61F2/954 (EP,US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2/86 (EP,US);
A61F2002/065 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2005/29] |
Former [2004/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Medizinisches Gerät mit doppeltem Führungsdraht | [2004/45] | English: | Dual guide-wire medical device | [2004/45] | French: | Dispositif medical avec fil guide double | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 04.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/05] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0965311 (MEDTRONIC AVE INC [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [A]US6248122 (KLUMB KATHERINE J [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 28; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2002111675 (WILSON W STAN [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0043]; figures 11,12 *; | [A]WO02068012 (ADVANCED STENT TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |