EP1498802 - Apparatus and method for controlling a fan drive in a computer system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HA, Chang Jin 831-1701 Joogong Apt. Byukjuk-gol 927-2, Youngtong-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si, Kyunggi-do, 442-003 / KR | [2010/43] |
Former [2005/03] | 01 /
Chang, Jin HA 831-1701 Joogong Apt. Byukjuk-gol 927-2, Youngtong Paldal-gu Suwon-si Kyunggi-do 442-003 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/03] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010457.2 | 03.05.2004 | [2005/03] | Priority number, date | KR20030047855 | 14.07.2003 Original published format: KR 2003047855 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1498802 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1498802 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1498802 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/20, H05K7/20 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H05K7/20209 (EP,US);
G06F1/20 (KR);
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Lüfterantriebes in einer Rechenanlage | [2005/03] | English: | Apparatus and method for controlling a fan drive in a computer system | [2005/03] | French: | Appareil et procédé de contrôle d'un entrainement de ventilateur dans un ordinateur | [2005/03] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 12.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.11.2010 | BE | 10.11.2010 | CY | 10.11.2010 | CZ | 10.11.2010 | DK | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SE | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | ES | 21.02.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | IE | 03.05.2011 | LU | 03.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
TR | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
LU | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
LU | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
IE | 03.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
DK | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2010 | ||
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 10.11.2010 | |
BE | 10.11.2010 | ||
CY | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
ES | 21.02.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SE | 10.11.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6390379 (HUANG TE-HSUN [TW]) [A] 1-22* column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 16; figure 4 *; | [X]US2002140389 (OHKI YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0042]; figure 2 *; | [X]US6470289 (PETERS MARK W [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 54 * * column 12, line 5 - line 46 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [X] - "ELECTRONIC MOTOR CONTROL FOR FAN", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19930801), vol. 36, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 559 - 560, XP000390334 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * |