EP1484535 - A tube valve, a tube valve apparatus and a head cleaning apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akahori, Yutaka Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010653.6 | 05.05.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | JP20030134817 | 13.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003134817 | JP20040004125 | 09.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004004125 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1484535 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484535 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/06, F16K31/524 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
F16K7/065 (EP,US);
F16K31/52491 (EP,US);
F16K7/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rohrventil, Rohrventilvorrichtung und Kopfreinigungsvorrichtung | [2004/50] | English: | A tube valve, a tube valve apparatus and a head cleaning apparatus | [2004/50] | French: | Vanne tubulaire, appareil à vanne tubulaire et appareil de nettoyage de tête | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 19.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1077932 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH) [X] 1 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB891299 (PLESSEY CO LTD) [X] 1 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 112; figures 2,3 *; | [XA]US3182602 (PRICE WILLIAM B) [X] 1-4,6-13,15,16,19,22,23 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-6 * [A] 24,36-38; | [X]GB1012565 (GODDARD & SONS LTD J) [X] 1,2,6 * page 2, lines 14-94; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3411534 (ROSE FRANK L) [X] 1,24,27-33,35 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 4; figures 1-12 *; | [X]US3951571 (JUNG WERNER) [X] 1,2,4-6,37,38 * column 2, line 39 - column 7, line 12; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US5139018 (BRODSKY DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 20 - column 10, line 6; figures 1-12 *; | [X]DE19745513 (WALZ KARL HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1* column 2, lines 11-50; figures 1-3b *; | [X]US5901745 (BUCHTEL DEAN H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,24,27-30 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 55; figures 3-5 * |