EP1479685 - Process for the preparation of pyridine-2-boronic acid esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meudt, Andreas, Dr. Fischbacher Weg 24 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
Lehnemann, Bernd, Dr. Kriegkstr. 54 60326 Franfurt / DE | 03 /
Scherer, Stefan, Dr. Lerchenweg 5 64572 Büttelborn / DE | 04 /
Kalinin, Alexei, Dr. 201-27 Elmwood Street Kingston ON, 7, KM 8Y5 / CA | 05 /
Snieckus, Victor, Dr. 23 Earl Street Kingston ON, K7L 2G4 / CA | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Hütter, Klaus, Dr., et al Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010777.3 | 06.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | DE2003122844 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10322844 | [2004/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1479685 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07F5/02 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pyridin-2-boronsäureestern | [2004/48] | English: | Process for the preparation of pyridine-2-boronic acid esters | [2004/48] | French: | Procédé de préparation de pyridine-2 esters d' acides boroniques | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/53] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9803484 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7 * example 21 *; | [A]WO9841511 (MERCK FROSST CANADA INC [CA], et al) [A] 1,3,5,7 * example 30 *; | [A]EP1236730 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,4,5,9,10,8,7 * page 5, line 36 - page 6, paragraph 27; claim 1 * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [A] - O'NEILL, BRIAN T. ET AL, "Total Synthesis of (.+-.)-Cytisine", ORGANIC LETTERS , 2(26), 4201-4204 CODEN: ORLEF7; ISSN: 1523-7060, (2000), XP002211572 [A] 1,3,5,7 * Scheme 1; page 4202, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol0067538 | [A] - FERNANDO, S. R. L. ET AL, "A Negative Activation Energy for Luminescence Decay: Specific Solvation Effects on the Emission Properties of Bis(2,2'- bipyridine)(3,5-dicarboxy-2,2'-bipyridine)ruthenium(II) Chloride", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY , 118(24), 5783-5790 CODEN: JACSAT; ISSN: 0002-7863, (1996), XP002289627 [A] 1,3,5 * Herstellung der Verbindung 3 und "Scheme 1"; page 5784, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 5785, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja954015m |