EP1484615 - Method for detecting fibrinogen and/or fibrinogen derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stief, Thomas, Dr. Limesstrasse 15 35415 Pohlheim / DE | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Ackermann, Joachim Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Ackermann Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Ackermann, Joachim, Dr. Postfach 11 13 26 60048 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04010893.8 | 02.06.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | DE2003125173 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325173 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484615 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484615 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1484615 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/86, C12Q1/56 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
C12Q1/56 (EP,US);
G01N33/86 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/50] | Title | German: | Nachweisverfahren für Fibrinogen und/oder Fibrinogen-Derivate | [2004/50] | English: | Method for detecting fibrinogen and/or fibrinogen derivatives | [2004/50] | French: | Procédé de détection du fibrinogène et/ou de ses derivés | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 31.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07009386.9 / EP1816478 | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.04.2008 | CZ | 16.04.2008 | DK | 16.04.2008 | EE | 16.04.2008 | FI | 16.04.2008 | PL | 16.04.2008 | RO | 16.04.2008 | SI | 16.04.2008 | SK | 16.04.2008 | TR | 16.04.2008 | LU | 02.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 16.07.2008 | SE | 16.07.2008 | GR | 17.07.2008 | HU | 17.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
TR | 16.04.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
HU | 17.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
LU | 02.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CY | 16.04.2008 | |
CZ | 16.04.2008 | ||
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
EE | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 16.04.2008 | |
DK | 16.04.2008 | ||
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
RO | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
SK | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 16.04.2008 | |
FI | 16.04.2008 | ||
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
SE | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 16.04.2008 | |
PL | 16.04.2008 | ||
SI | 16.04.2008 | ||
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 16.04.2008 | |
BG | 16.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 16.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0137269 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-14,24,26,27,29,30 * claim 1 *; | [DXA]DE4133946 (BEHRINGWERKE AG [DE]) [DX] 24,26,27,29,30 [A] 1-14; | [XA]US5292664 (FICKENSCHER KARL [DE]) [X] 24,26,27,29,30 * column 4, lines 11-16 * * claims 1,3 * [A] 1-14,1-14; | [XA]EP0699909 (NIPPON SHOJI KAISHA LTD [JP]) [X] 24,26,27,29,30 * claim 16 * [A] 1-14; | [X] - COLLER B S ET AL, "Effects of vancomycin on platelets, plasma proteins and hepatitis B surface antigen", THROMB.DIATHES.HAEMORRH. 1975, (1975), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 83 - 93, XP009048680 [X] 1,15-23,25,26,28-30 * abstract * * page 84, paragraph 11 - page 85, paragraph 1 * * page 91, paragraph 1 * |