EP1479599 - Mechanical safety device to temporarily block the wheels of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guadagnino, Antonio Via Brioni, 6 35134 Padova / IT | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guadagnino, Antonio Via Brioni, 6 35134 Padova / IT | 02 /
Riccardo, Savin Via Brioni, 6 35134 Padova / IT | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. Via Ariberto 24 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Lecce, Giovanni UFFICIO BREVETTI CALCIATI S.r.l. Via Fratelli Ruffini, 9 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04010963.9 | 07.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI01014 | 20.05.2003 Original published format: IT MI20031014 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479599 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479599 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B62H5/18 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B62H5/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Mechanische Sicherheitsvorrichtung zum zeitweiligen Blockieren von Fahrzeugrädern | [2004/48] | English: | Mechanical safety device to temporarily block the wheels of vehicles | [2004/48] | French: | Dispositif mécanique de sécurité pour bloquer temporairement des roues de véhicules | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 18.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2011 | 31.05.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2292920 (DUNKLEY THOMAS [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]GB2310839 (LEWIS STEPHEN [GB]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0232747 (WENZHOU SHENGLUN AUTO AND MOTO [CN], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [X]TW519075U (TOPEAK INC [TW]) [X] 1-6 * Assuming to have similar content as in DE document *; | DE10316708 [ ] (CHUANG LOUIS [TW]) [ ] * abstract * | by applicant | TW519075B | GB2310839 |