EP1479448 - DC power spraying tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jin Hua Jin Shun Tools Co., Ltd. Jin Shan Road Xiao Shun Town Jinhua Zhejiang / CN | [2007/29] |
Former [2004/48] | For all designated states Jin Hua Jin Shun Tools Co., Ltd. Jin Shan Road Xiao Shun Town Jinhua Zhejiang / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ye, Genzhang Jin Shan Road Xiao Shun Town Jinhua zhejiang / CN | 02 /
Zhou, Suhu Jin Shan Road Xiao Shun Town Jinhua zhejiang / CN | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011202.1 | 11.05.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | US20030441485 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: US 441485 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1479448 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1479448 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1479448 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B05B9/08, H02H9/00 | [2004/48] | CPC: |
B05B9/0861 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Gleichstromgespeistes Sprühwerkzeug | [2004/48] | English: | DC power spraying tool | [2004/48] | French: | Appareil pulvérisateur à courant continu | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 11.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2007 | BE | 18.07.2007 | CH | 18.07.2007 | CY | 18.07.2007 | CZ | 18.07.2007 | DK | 18.07.2007 | EE | 18.07.2007 | FI | 18.07.2007 | LI | 18.07.2007 | NL | 18.07.2007 | PL | 18.07.2007 | RO | 18.07.2007 | SI | 18.07.2007 | SK | 18.07.2007 | TR | 18.07.2007 | BG | 18.10.2007 | SE | 18.10.2007 | GR | 19.10.2007 | ES | 29.10.2007 | PT | 18.12.2007 | HU | 19.01.2008 | FR | 14.03.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
HU | 19.01.2008 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CY | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SI | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
EE | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
FR | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
RO | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
SE | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
SK | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
DK | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
BE | 18.07.2007 | ||
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
GR | 19.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 18.07.2007 | |
CH | 18.07.2007 | ||
FI | 18.07.2007 | ||
LI | 18.07.2007 | ||
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
PL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 18.07.2007 | |
NL | 18.07.2007 | ||
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
PT | 18.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 18.07.2007 | |
BG | 18.10.2007 | ||
ES | 29.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 29.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3927879 (KREBS THEO AG [CH]) [Y] 3,5* column 3, lines 12-14 *; | [XAY]US2002011531 (DIMAGGIO PHILLIP JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0037]; figure - * [A] 4 [Y] 3,5; | [X]US2002125341 (PERKITNY JERZY [US]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] * |