15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
23.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
08.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
25.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] |
04.02.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.03.2011 [2011/10] |
21.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
17.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] |
05.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] |
15.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] |
08.10.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
26.02.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] |
16.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.02.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.10.2009 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
29.09.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.11.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
19.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.06.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.12.2006 |
First examination report |
|
16.12.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.06.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
16.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
30.09.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |