Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1595473 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | B1 | EP1595473 | 16.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04011383 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE462323T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP04011383 | 13.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502004010972D1 | 12.05.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP04011383 | 13.05.2004 |