27.01.2012 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
19.01.2012 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
12.07.2011 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2007 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2006 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
14.07.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of appeal |
|
28.04.2006 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
04.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
04.02.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
04.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2005 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.04.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.04.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
27.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2004 |
First examination report |
|
14.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
05.11.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.10.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2004 |
Publication of search report |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
30.07.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
10.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
10.07.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|