EP1458066 - Line selected F2 two chamber laser system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 26.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cymer, Inc. 17075 Thornmint Court San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knowles, David S. 3696 Landfair Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
Brown, Daniel J., W. 11981 Brewster Court San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 03 /
Sandstrom, Richard, L. 410 Bridoon Terrace Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
Rylov, German E. 24098 Orleans Lane Murrieta, CA 92562 / US | 05 /
Onkels, Eckehard, D. 12008 Caminito Ryone San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 06 /
Besaucele, Herve A. 3583 Utah Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | 07 /
Myers, David, W. 15227 Crestview Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | 08 /
Ershov, Alexander, I. 11312 Meadow Flower Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | 09 /
Partlo, William N. 12634 Pedriza Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | 10 /
Fomenkov, Igor, V. 14390 Janal Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 11 /
Ujazdowski, Richard, C. 14540 Twin Peaks Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | 12 /
Ness, Richard, M. 9248 Citrus View Court San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 13 /
Smith, Scot, T. 15124 Calle Juanito San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 14 /
Hulburd, William, G. 11351 Calle Dario San Diego, CA 92126 / US | [2004/42] |
Former [2004/38] | 01 /
Knowles, David S. 12535 Montellano Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
Brown, Daniel J., W. 14020 Chicarita Creek Road San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
03 /
Sandstrom, Richard, L. 410 Bridoon Terrace Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
04 /
Rylov, German E. 24098 Orleans Lane Murrieta, CA 92562 / US | |||
05 /
Onkels, Eckehard, D. 12008 Caminito Ryone San Diego, CA 92128 / US | |||
06 /
Besaucele, Herve A. 3583 Utah Street San Diego, CA 92104 / US | |||
07 /
Myers, David, W. 15227 Crestview Court Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
08 /
Ershov, Alexander, I. 11312 Meadow Flower Place San Diego, CA 92127 / US | |||
09 /
Partlo, William N. 12634 Pedriza Drive Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
10 /
Fomenkov, Igor, V. 14390 Janal Way San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
11 /
Ujazdowski, Richard, C. 14540 Twin Peaks Road Poway, CA 92064 / US | |||
12 /
Ness, Richard, M. 9248 Citrus View Court San Diego, CA 92126 / US | |||
13 /
Smith, Scot, T. 15124 Calle Juanito San Diego, CA 92129 / US | |||
14 /
Hulburd, William, G. 11351 Calle Dario San Diego, CA 92126 / US | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011567.7 | 19.08.2002 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | US20010943343 | 29.08.2001 Original published format: US 943343 | US20010970503 | 03.10.2001 Original published format: US 970503 | US20010000991 | 14.11.2001 Original published format: US 991 | US20010006913 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: US 6913 | US20010012002 | 30.11.2001 Original published format: US 12002 | US20010036727 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 36727 | US20010036676 | 21.12.2001 Original published format: US 36676 | US20020056619 | 23.01.2002 Original published format: US 56619 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1458066 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1458066 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458066 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/225, H01S3/23 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H01S3/2366 (EP,US);
H01S3/10 (KR);
G01J9/00 (EP,US);
G03F7/70025 (EP,US);
G03F7/70041 (EP,US);
G03F7/70575 (EP,US);
G03F7/70933 (EP,US);
H01S3/03 (EP,US);
H01S3/036 (EP,US);
H01S3/038 (EP,US);
H01S3/0385 (EP,US);
H01S3/08 (EP,US);
H01S3/08004 (EP,US);
H01S3/09705 (EP,US);
H01S3/0971 (EP,US);
H01S3/104 (EP,US);
H01S3/105 (EP,US);
H01S3/223 (EP,US);
H01S3/225 (EP,US);
H01S3/2333 (EP,US);
H01S3/0057 (EP,US);
H01S3/0071 (EP,US);
H01S3/02 (EP,US);
H01S3/0387 (EP,US);
H01S3/0404 (EP,US);
H01S3/041 (EP,US);
H01S3/08009 (EP,US);
H01S3/08036 (EP,US);
H01S3/0943 (EP,US);
H01S3/097 (EP,US);
H01S3/09702 (EP,US);
H01S3/0975 (EP,US);
H01S3/1305 (EP,US);
H01S3/134 (EP,US);
H01S3/139 (EP,US);
H01S3/22 (EP,US);
H01S3/2207 (EP,US);
H01S3/2251 (EP,US);
H01S3/2256 (EP,US);
H01S3/2258 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/01] | H01S3/038, H01S3/225, H01S3/223, H01S3/23, H01S3/036 | ||
Former IPC [2004/38] | H01S3/223, H01S3/23, H01S3/036, H01S3/038 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2009/04] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | F2-Zweikammerlasersystem mit Linienauswahl | [2004/38] | English: | Line selected F2 two chamber laser system | [2004/38] | French: | Système laser F2 à deux chambres et avec selection de ligne | [2008/23] |
Former [2004/38] | Système de laser F2 a raie selectionnée, a deux enceintes | Examination procedure | 14.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 09.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02773221.3 / EP1438772 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | BE | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | CZ | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | IT | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | SE | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | ES | 02.05.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | GB | 19.08.2009 | IE | 19.08.2009 | LU | 19.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | FR | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
GB | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
LU | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
IT | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
GB | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
GB | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
GB | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 19.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
FR | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
ES | 02.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | ES | 02.05.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JP2000223408 ; | [Y]JPH05167136 ; | [Y]GB1197123 (LASER SCIENCES INC [US]) [Y] 25-27 * abstract * * page 4, line 108 - page 5, line 102 *; | [Y]US5377215 (DAS PALASH P [US], et al) [Y] 45,46 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6034978 (UJAZDOWSKI RICHARD C [US], et al) [Y] 45,46 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6067311 (MORTON RICHARD G [US], et al) [Y] 67-76 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0038286 (CYMER INC [US], et al) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]WO0124327 (CYMER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-24,28,34-36,38,39,44,47-55,58-66 * pages 3-5 * * pages 12-14,22 * * pages 31-33 * * pages 43-46 * * figures 3,5a-6b,7b,14a,14c,22c * * abstract * [Y] 1,12,25-27,37,40-42,45,46,56,57,67-76; | [PXY]WO0231932 (CYMER INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-11,13-24,28-33,36,45,46,56,57,60,61 * pages 3-12 * * pages 30,45 * * claims 7-17 * * figures 1-4b,21,21a * * claims 5,18-23 * [PY] 12,25-27,37,40-42,67-76; | [PY]DE10102143 (LAMBDA PHYSIK AG [DE]) [PY] 40 * paragraphs [0001] - [0013]; figure 1 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, & JP2000223408 A 20000811 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 12,37,41,42 * abstract * [A] 43 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931015), vol. 017, no. 570, Database accession no. (E - 1448), & JP05167136 A 19930702 (KOMATSU LTD) [Y] 56,57 * abstract * |