EP1482366 - Maskless lithography using spatial light modulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bleeker, Arno Steenovens 67 5563 CE Westerhoven / NL | 02 /
Cebuhar, Wenceslao A. 514 Foxboro Drive Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | 03 /
Hintersteiner, Jason D. 26 Kristy Drive Bethel, Connecticut 06801 / US | 04 /
Mc Cullough, Andrew W. 20 Aunt Park Lane Newton, Connecticut 06470 / US | 05 /
Wassermann, Solomon S. 145 East Penn Street Long Beach, New York 11561 / US | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2004/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011778.0 | 18.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | US20030449908 | 30.05.2003 Original published format: US 449908 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482366 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482366 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G03F7/70466 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2057 (KR);
G03F7/70283 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70291 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70358 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70558 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/25] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Maskenlose Lithographie unter Verwendung räumlicher Lichtmodulatoren | [2004/49] | English: | Maskless lithography using spatial light modulators | [2004/49] | French: | Lithographie sans masque utilisant des modulateurs spatiaux de lumière | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5870176 (SWEATT WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 38-54 * * figure 4 *; | [X]WO0212961 (BALL SEMICONDUCTOR INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 5, lines 13-15 * * page 8, lines 1-26 ** figure 7 *; | [X]EP1280007 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 1-39 * paragraphs [0015] , [0041] , [0047] , [0048] * * figures 1,3,11,14-20 * | by applicant | US5870176 | WO0212961 | EP1280007 |