EP1482515 - Holographic data storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Daewoo Electronics Corporation 686, Ahyeon-Dong Mapo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Joo-Youn Daewoo Electronics Corp. 686 Ahyeon-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Jacoby, Georg, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Jacoby, Georg, Dr., et al Samson & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04011926.5 | 19.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | KR20030035040 | 31.05.2003 Original published format: KR 2003035040 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482515 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482515 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C13/04, G11B7/0065 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G11C13/042 (EP,US);
G11B7/0065 (KR);
G11B7/24053 (EP,US);
G11B7/24044 (EP,US);
G11B7/24094 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/36] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Holographisches Datenspeichermedium | [2004/49] | English: | Holographic data storage medium | [2004/49] | French: | Mémoire de données holographiques | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 16.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/49] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5566387 (DEWALD DUANE S [US]) [Y] 3 * column 4, lines 17-36; figure 1a *[A] 4,5; | [XAY]WO02103689 (TESA AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 14, line 19 - page 21, line 16; figures 1-6 * [A] 4,5 [Y] 3 |