Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
30.08.2006 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.06.2006 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.06.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.06.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] |
30.09.2005 | Publication of search report | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
13.05.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |
13.05.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.06.2005 [2005/26] |