EP1548353 - Optical arrangement with Fresnel lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kittelmann, Rüdiger Birkenweg 5 37574 Einbeck / DE | 02 /
Wagener, Harry Eschenbachstrasse 12 31061 Alfeld / DE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Herden, Andreas, Dipl.-Ing. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012005.7 | 21.05.2004 | [2005/26] | Priority number, date | DE20031061121 | 22.12.2003 Original published format: DE 10361121 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1548353 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1548353 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/00, F21V14/02, F21V14/06, G02B3/08 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
F21V3/04 (EP,US);
F21V5/04 (EP,US);
F21V9/08 (EP,US);
G02B3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/29] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optische Anordnung mit Stufenlinse | [2005/26] | English: | Optical arrangement with Fresnel lens | [2005/26] | French: | Dispositif optique avec lentille de Fresnel | [2005/26] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 17.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 20.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 20.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2394992 (KURT FRANCK) [X] 1-30 * page 2, column R, line 13 - line 15 * * figures 6-9 *; | [A]US2480031 (KELLOGG EDWARD W) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [X]US2853599 (KLIEGL HERBERT A) [X] 1-30 * column 3, line 59 - line 62 * * figure - *; | [A]US3718078 (PLUMMER W) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [X]GB2041189 (KONEN H) [X] 1-30 * abstract *; | [A]EP0428360 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-30* abstract *; | [X]US5775799 (FORKNER JOHN F [US]) [X] 31-38,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]US2002024822 (POND GREGORY [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 1-3A *; | [XA]US2002034710 (MORRIS G MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 31-37,43-45 * paragraphs [0053] , [0068] , [0097] , [0115] , [0204] , [0205] * * claims 8,39,89 * * figures 1,20,38 * [A] 1-30,38-42; | [A]US2003007359 (SUGAWARA SABURO [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract *; | [X]US2003039035 (YOSHIKAWA TAKEHISA [JP], et al) [X] 31-38,43-45 * abstract *; | [X]US2003169514 (BOURDELAIS ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 31-38,43-45 * abstract * |