EP1500456 - Remotely controlled welding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County Illinois 60025 / US | ||
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynolds, Jon O. 2018 Hickory Court Appleton Wisconsin 54914 / US | 02 /
Young, Eric N1965 Julius Drive Greenville Wisconsin 54942 / US | 03 /
Albrecht, Bruce 200 Lakeshore Drive Hortonville, Wisconsin 54944 / US | 04 /
Hogan, Michael W. 514 East Brewster Street Appleton Wisconsin 54911 / US | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/04] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012057.8 | 21.05.2004 | [2005/04] | Priority number, date | US20030604482 | 24.07.2003 Original published format: US 604482 | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500456 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1500456 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/10 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
B23K9/1087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, FR, GB, IT [2005/41] |
Former [2005/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ferngesteuerte Schweissmaschine | [2005/04] | English: | Remotely controlled welding machine | [2005/04] | French: | Machine à souder commandée à distance | [2005/04] | Examination procedure | 21.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 17.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003154455 ; | [X]JP2003191075 ; | [X]JP4162964 ; | [X]JPS61137675 ; | [A]US4266114 (HANSEN KJELL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US4508954 (KROLL ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]EP0575082 (KEMPPI OY [FI]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US6040555 (TILLER RANDOLPH C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6103994 (DECOSTER ALBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6570132 (BRUNNER MICHAEL [AT], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030903), vol. 2003, no. 09, & JP2003154455 A 20030527 (DAIHEN CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003191075 A 20030708 (DAIHEN CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920924), vol. 0164, no. 58, Database accession no. (M - 1315), & JP4162964 A 19920608 (DENYOO KK) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861112), vol. 0103, no. 33, Database accession no. (M - 534), & JP61137675 A 19860625 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |