EP1514488 - Toe-cap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otter Schutz GmbH Xantener Strasse 6 45479 Mülheim/Ruhr / DE | [2005/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mattil, Klaus Prof Langgarten 7 66989 Höheinöd / DE | 02 /
Götze, Joachim Xantener Strasse 6 45479 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | [2005/11] | Representative(s) | Moldenhauer, Herbert, et al Gartenstrasse 8 67598 Gundersheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/11] | Moldenhauer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gartenstrasse 8 67598 Gundersheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012064.4 | 21.05.2004 | [2005/11] | Priority number, date | DE2003141706 | 10.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341706 | [2005/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1514488 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A43B23/10 | [2005/11] | CPC: |
A43B23/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] |
Former [2005/49] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zehenschutzkappe | [2005/11] | English: | Toe-cap | [2005/11] | French: | Embout de sécurité d'orteils | [2005/11] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 02.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.10.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | 25.10.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   02.11.2005 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2381280 (BERT HANDELSMAN) [A] 1,15-17* the whole document *; | [A]FR1027089 (MANUF DE CHAUSSURES CLEMENT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1744337U (SCHABSKY ATLAS SCHUHFAB [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE9411460U (BIRKENSTOCK KARL [DE]) [DA] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE9411460U |