EP1482100 - Building wall construction with roller shutter box and thermal insulation plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Weber GmbH Clevischer Ring 127 51063 Köln / DE | [2004/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hildebrand, Markus, Dr. Wilhelm-Ziemons-Str. 43 52078 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Hösle, Richard, Dr. Eichenweg 6 73095 Albershausen / DE | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
Hildebrand, Markus, Dr. Wilhelm-Ziemons-Str. 43 73095 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
Hösle, Richard, Dr. Eichenweg 6 73095 Albershausen / DE | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | LOUIS- PÖHLAU- LOHRENTZ P.O. BOX 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012157.6 | 22.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | DE2003126015 | 29.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10326015 | [2004/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482100 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482100 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482100 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/80, E06B9/17 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
E04B1/7641 (EP);
E04B1/80 (EP);
E06B9/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/49] | Title | German: | Gebäudewandkonstruktion mit Rolladenkasten mit Wärmedämmplatten | [2004/49] | English: | Building wall construction with roller shutter box and thermal insulation plates | [2004/49] | French: | Construction d'un mur de bâtiment avec caisson de volet roulant et plaques d'isolation thermique | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/41] | 07.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | GB | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | IT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | PL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | ES | 24.09.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | FR | 08.02.2008 | [2010/38] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
HU | 14.12.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
FR | 08.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
IT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 13.06.2007 | |
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 13.06.2007 | |
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | PL | 13.06.2007 | |
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
ES | 24.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | PL | 13.06.2007 | |
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | PL | 13.06.2007 | |
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | SE | 13.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8325087U (BAUER ANTON) [A] 1* page 4, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]DE9107425U (KIPF & SOHN) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, line 32; figure - *; | [A]DE19643618 (STO AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |