EP1458052 - Unfoldable electromagnetic reflector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETIENNE LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES SA 6, Boulevard de Joffrery 31600 Muret / FR | [2007/22] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states ETIENNE LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES SA 6, Boulevard de Joffrery 31600 Muret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mourry, Philippe 29, chemin de Pecette 31520 Ramonville / FR | 02 /
Garon, Lionel 13 rue Lejeune 31000 Toulouse / FR | 03 /
Pinchot, Jean-Luc 248 avenue R. Tissandié 31600 Muret / FR | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Texier, Christian, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04012193.1 | 21.02.2002 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | FR20010002483 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102483 | FR20010002484 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102484 | FR20010002485 | 23.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102485 | [2004/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1458052 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1458052 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/08, H01Q15/16, H01Q15/14, H01Q15/20 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
H01Q15/141 (EP,US);
H01Q1/08 (EP,US);
H01Q15/161 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/22] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Entfaltbarer Elektromagnetischer Reflektor | [2004/38] | English: | Unfoldable electromagnetic reflector | [2004/38] | French: | Reflecteur electromagnetique deployable | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/15] | 19.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02704870.1 / EP1362386 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.05.2007 | CY | 30.05.2007 | FI | 30.05.2007 | IE | 30.05.2007 | NL | 30.05.2007 | GR | 31.08.2007 | ES | 10.09.2007 | PT | 30.10.2007 | LU | 21.02.2008 | TR | 21.02.2008 | SE | 22.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | CH | 29.02.2008 | LI | 29.02.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
LU | 21.02.2008 | ||
SE | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
CY | 30.05.2007 | ||
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
SE | 22.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
CH | 29.02.2008 | ||
LI | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
GR | 31.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
IE | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
PT | 30.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
NL | 30.05.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 30.05.2007 | |
FI | 30.05.2007 | ||
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 30.05.2007 | |
ES | 10.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | ES | 10.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB746300 (ANTHONY EDGAR PORTER) [X] 2-8,12-17,19-22 * page 1, lines 15-59 * * page 2, lines 8-14,60-65,85-90 * * page 3, lines 2-6 * * figures 1,7-9 *; | [A]GB812376 (ANTHONY EDGAR PORTER, et al) [A] 22,36* figures 1,4 *; | [X]US3296617 (ROGALLO FRANCIS M) [X] 1-3,23-31 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 54-60 * * column 3, lines 41-47 * * column 4, lines 55-58 * * column 6, lines 12,13,29-31 *; | [X]US3618111 (VAUGHAN DESMOND H) [X] 32,37 * column 5, line 68 - line 75 * * column 6, line 1 - line 39; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9321367 (PROTECMA [FR], et al) [A] 18-20 * claims 4,6 *; | [X]EP0807991 (TRW INC [US]) [X] 5-11 * column 3, line 21 - line 53 * * column 4, line 17 - line 59 * * column 5, line 1 - line 15 * * column 7, line 26 - line 46; figures 1,4 *; | [A]EP1052725 (AEROSPATIALE MATRA LANCEURS ST [FR]) [A] 21 * column 2, line 44 - line 51 * |