EP1457339 - Ink composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/38] | Methods and apparatus preventing ink jet printer nozzle clogging | ||
[2005/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026-1215 / US | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026-1215 / US | ||
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states Trident International, Inc. Building 2, 1114 Federal Road Brookfield, CT 06804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenberger, John E. 135 Roxbury Road Plantsville, CT 06479 / US | 02 /
Fox, James E. 68 Cromwell Road Cambridge CB1 3EG / US | 03 /
Hudd, Alan L. Bury Cottage, Bury End Nuthampstead, Hertfordshire, SG8 8NG / GB | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Heinze, Ekkehard, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Heinze, Ekkehard, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Gbr, Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012274.9 | 15.07.1998 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | US19970903016 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: US 903016 | [2004/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1457339 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457339 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165, B41J2/05, C09D11/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
B41J2/165 (EP,US);
B41J2/16526 (EP,US);
B41J2/16552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2004/38] | Title | German: | Tintenzusammensetzung | [2005/46] | English: | Ink composition | [2005/46] | French: | Composition d'encre | [2005/46] |
Former [2004/38] | Verfahren und Gerät zur Verhinderung von Düsenverstopfungen bei Tintenstrahldruckern | ||
Former [2004/38] | Methods and apparatus preventing ink jet printer nozzle clogging | ||
Former [2004/38] | Procédé et appareil prévenant des obstructions dans les buses d'imprimantes à jet d'encre | Examination procedure | 25.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 02.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98935656.3 / EP0998392 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.05.2006 | CH | 03.05.2006 | FI | 03.05.2006 | LI | 03.05.2006 | NL | 03.05.2006 | IE | 17.07.2006 | SE | 03.08.2006 | ES | 14.08.2006 | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/42] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
IT | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.07.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.07.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
NL | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
CH | 03.05.2006 | ||
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
LI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 03.05.2006 | |
FI | 03.05.2006 | ||
SE | 03.08.2006 | ||
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 03.08.2006 | |
ES | 14.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 03.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4266232 (JULIANA JR ANTHONY, et al) [DY] 9-19* column 3, line 59 - column 6, line 21; figures 1,4 *; | [XY]US4597794 (OHTA TOKUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [Y] 9-19 | Examination | US4791165 | US5329293 | by applicant | US3925789 | US4266232 | US4459601 | US4540997 | US4970527 | US5329293 |