EP1465199 - Memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2004/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Steffen Forststr. 8b 82065 Baierbrunn / DE | 02 /
Seifert, Martin Hamburger Str. 25 80809 München / DE | [2004/46] |
Former [2004/41] | 01 /
Paul, Steffen Forststr. 8b 82065 Baierbrunn / DE | ||
02 /
Seifert, Martin St.-Martin-Str. 40 81541 München / DE | Representative(s) | Repkow, Ines, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte PartG mbB Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Repkow, Ines, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012400.0 | 03.11.2000 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | DE19991055779 | 19.11.1999 Original published format: DE 19955779 | [2004/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465199 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1465199 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11C8/10, G11C8/12, G11C7/06, G11C11/418 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
G11C7/062 (EP,US);
G11C7/00 (KR);
G11C7/065 (EP,US);
G11C2207/063 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/41] | G11C8/12, G11C8/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI | Title | German: | Speichereinrichtung | [2004/41] | English: | Memory device | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/41] | 05.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00979447.0 / EP1245030 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3648071 (MRAZEK DALE A) [Y] 2,3 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3760194 (LUTZ R, et al) [A] 2,3 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 58; figure 2 *; | [XY]US5282173 (MIYAJI FUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * figures 2,6 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]EP0747903 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [IT]) [A] 1* column W * | Examination | US5111080 |