EP1510736 - Sealing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERITAS AG Stettiner Strasse 1-9 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | For all designated states ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 2 72581 Dettingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | For all designated states VERITAS AG Stettiner Strasse 1-9 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | ||
For all designated states ElringKlinger AG Max-Eyth-Strasse 65 72581 Dettingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bock, Stefan Johann-Klugstrasse 7 63762 Grossostheim/Ringheim / DE | 02 /
Rösch, Thomas Weinbergweg 3 63589 Linsengericht / DE | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012452.1 | 26.05.2004 | [2005/09] | Priority number, date | DE2003139718 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10339718 | [2005/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1510736 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/10, F16J15/12 | [2005/09] | CPC: |
F16J15/121 (EP,US);
F16J15/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Title | German: | Dichtelement | [2005/09] | English: | Sealing element | [2005/09] | French: | Elément d'étanchéité | [2005/09] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 02.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/25] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1328706 (PNEUMO DYNAMICS CORP) [X] 1-4,11,12,15-19* page 1, column R, line 30 - page 2, column L, line 10; figure - *; | [X]GB1195228 (ANGUS GEORGE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,10,11,14,27 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]DE19943473 (ATU ARMATUREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,12,15-30 * column 3, line 48 - line 63; figure 1 * * column 2, line 31 - line 37 *; | [X]WO03016756 (PARKER HANNIFIN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15,21-24,27-29 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP0817929 |