EP1482446 - Region detecting method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama City Wakayama, 640-8550 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states Noritsu Koki Co., Ltd. 579-1, Umehara Wakayama City Wakayama, 640-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Omatsu, Shigeru 5-19-1, Haze-cho Sakai-city Osaka 599-8238 / JP | 02 /
Mitsukura, Yasue 4-18-H2-305, Tsushimahigashi Okayama-city Okayama 700-0081 / JP | 03 /
Fukumi, Minoru 6-2, Nakasuji Komatsushima-cho Komatsushima-city Tokushima 773-0000 / JP | 04 /
Mitsukura, Kensuke 4-18-H2-305, Tsushimahigashi Okayama-city Okayama 700-0081 / JP | 05 /
Kita, Koji 9-1-206, Ibaramoto Iwade-cho Naga-gun Wakayama 649-6232 / JP | 06 /
Kugo, Kouichi 402-1 No. 306, Naka Wakayama-city Wakayama 640-8451 / JP | [2004/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012503.1 | 26.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | JP20030148069 | 26.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003148069 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482446 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482446 | Date: | 13.04.2005 | [2005/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2004/49] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06V40/162 (EP,US);
G06T7/136 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Vorrichtung zur Regionenerkennung | [2004/49] | English: | Region detecting method and apparatus | [2004/49] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de la détection de régions | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2005/48] | 14.10.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/48] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.11.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.11.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - MITSUKURA Y ET AL, "Fast face detection system for time-varying images using the GA-threshold method", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IASTED INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE APPLIED INFORMATICS. INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE AND APPLICATIONS ACTA PRESS ANAHEIM, CA, USA, (20020218), ISBN 0-88986-324-5, pages 89 - 92, XP002305823 [X] 1-3,7-10,14 * the whole document * [Y] 4-6,11-13,15,16 | [Y] - CHONG JINSONG ET AL, "Entropic thresholding method using genetic algorithm", GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING SYMPOSIUM, 1999. IGARSS '99 PROCEEDINGS. IEEE 1999 INTERNATIONAL HAMBURG, GERMANY 28 JUNE-2 JULY 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990628), ISBN 0-7803-5207-6, pages 1247 - 1249, XP010337634 [Y] 4-6,11-13,15,16 * page 1248 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IGARSS.1999.774593 | [Y] - YIN P-Y, "A fast scheme for optimal thresholding using genetic algorithms - a new approach", SIGNAL PROCESSING, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990115), vol. 72, no. 2, ISSN 0165-1684, pages 85 - 95, XP004153068 [Y] 4-6,11-13,15,16 * section 3: "Proposed Scheme" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-1684(98)00167-4 |