EP1482152 - Control apparatus and control method for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/49] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref., 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuwa, Naohide c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Dohta, Hisayo c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref, 448-8661 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2004/49] | 01 /
Fuwa, Naohide c/o TOYOTA JID. KAB. KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Dohta, Hisayo c/o DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref, 448-8661 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/49] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04012643.5 | 27.05.2004 | [2004/49] | Priority number, date | JP20030149319 | 27.05.2003 Original published format: JP 2003149319 | [2004/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1482152 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1482152 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1482152 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/02, F02D41/18, F02D41/14, F02D41/24, F02D41/00 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
F02D41/18 (EP,US);
F02D13/0211 (EP,US);
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D41/2464 (EP,US);
F02D2041/001 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0402 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
F02D41/042 (EP,US);
F02D41/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/49] | F02D13/02, F02D41/18, F02D41/14, F02D41/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/47] |
Former [2004/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zu Steuerung einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/49] | English: | Control apparatus and control method for internal combustion engine | [2004/49] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commande d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/49] | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 05.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH033910 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * abstract * [A] 3,5-10,13,14; | [X]EP0719925 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * page 1, line 21 - line 43 * * page 2, line 27 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0728929 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * page 2, line 26 - line 38 * * page 2, line 39 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [X]US5816230 (KUROKAWA NAOHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,12 * line 48 - column 2, line 16 * * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 6; figure 1 *; | [XDA]JP2003041976 (HITACHI UNISIA AUTOMOTIVE LTD) [XD] 1,2 * abstract *[A] 3-14 | by applicant | JPH033910 | EP0719925 | EP0728929 | US5816230 | JP2003041976 |