EP1602321 - Method and apparatus for image-based eye tracking for retinal diagnostic or surgery device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SensoMotoric Instruments GmbH Warthestrasse 21 14513 Teltow / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states SensoMotoric Instruments GmbH Warthestrasse 21 14513 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teiwes, Winfried, Dr. c/o SensoMotoric Instruments GmbH Warthestr.21 14513 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Grecu, Horia c/o SensoMotoric Intruments GmbH Warthestr.21 14513 Berlin / DE | [2005/49] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013015.5 | 02.06.2004 | [2005/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1602321 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/113, A61F9/007 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
A61B3/113 (EP,US);
A61B3/102 (US);
A61B3/145 (US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T7/0016 (US);
G06V40/193 (US);
A61F2009/00846 (EP,US);
A61F2009/00872 (EP,US);
A61F9/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/33] |
Former [2005/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Methode und Gerät zur bildgestützten Augenverfolgung bei Apparaten zur Diagnose oder Chirurgie der Retina | [2005/49] | English: | Method and apparatus for image-based eye tracking for retinal diagnostic or surgery device | [2005/49] | French: | Méthode et appareil de poursuite oculaire pour appareil de diagnostic ou de chirurgie rétinal | [2005/49] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5865832 (KNOPP CARL F [US], et al) [A] 11,30 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19954047 (CHRONOS VISION GMBH [DE]) [A] 11,30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO02064031 (SENSOMOTORIC INSTRUMENTS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,20,39 * page 9, line 18 - page 15, line 14 *; | [X]US2002141614 (LIN YUN-TING [US]) [X] 34-38* column 13, line 53 - column 14, line 18 *; | [A]WO03053228 (SENSOMOTORIC INSTRUMENTS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,20,39 * page 3, line 28 - page 14, line L *; | [A] - MULLIGAN J B, "IMAGE PROCESSING FOR IMPROVED EYE-TRACKING ACCURACY", BEHAVIOR RESEARCH METHODS, INSTRUMENTS AND COMPUTERS, PSYCHONOMIC SOCIETY, US, (19960510), vol. 29, no. 1, ISSN 0743-3808, pages 54 - 65, XP009012062 [A] 1,20,39 * the whole document * |