EP1484779 - Control device for car-mounted electric device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya, Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Hiroyuki c/o ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 1-7 Yukigaya-Otsuka-cho, Ota-ku Tokyo 145-8501 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013041.1 | 02.06.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | JP20030159702 | 04.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003159702 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484779 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484779 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/00, G05G1/08 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
H01H25/04 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/25 (EP,US);
H01H19/005 (EP,US);
B60K2360/126 (EP,US);
H01H2003/008 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/50] | H01H25/04, H01H19/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/09] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Betätigungsvorrichtung eines in einem Fahrzeug montierten Gerätes | [2004/50] | English: | Control device for car-mounted electric device | [2004/50] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un appareil installé dans une voiture | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/29] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000325658 ; | [A]WO0077603 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002000971 (ARMSTRONG BRAD A [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1180736 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE10042028 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1205956 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]EP1213165 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010305), vol. 2000, no. 14, & JP2000325658 A 20001128 (HORI CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |