EP1484706 - Method for estimating effect of working substance and screening method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyamoto, Tetsuro c/o Hitachi Ltd., I.P. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 1-5-1,Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Togashi, Shigenori c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intel.Prop.Gr New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Miyake, Ryo c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intel.Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Naoya c/o Hitachi Ltd., Intel.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013045.2 | 02.06.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | JP20030158506 | 03.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003158506 | [2004/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484706 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484706 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/5082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/05] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schätzungsverfahren für die Wirkung einer aktiven Substanz und Screeningverfahren | [2004/50] | English: | Method for estimating effect of working substance and screening method | [2004/50] | French: | Procédé d'estimation de l'effet d'une substance active et procédé de criblage | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/50] | Procédé d'estimation de l'effet d'une substance active et procédé de criblage | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 26.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |