Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005004765 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003158506 | 03.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004357552 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003158506 | 03.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1484706 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2007 | A3 | EP1484706 | 08.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003158506 | 03.06.2003 |