12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
08.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
18.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
14.09.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
01.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] |
04.05.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
13.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] |
09.03.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] |
01.12.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
03.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
26.05.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] |
11.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.05.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.03.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
03.03.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.02.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.10.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.07.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] |
15.04.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
17.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2004 |
Change - German title |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
16.07.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
16.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|