Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1017262 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2004 | B1 | EP1017262 | 05.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99811150 | 13.12.1999 | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1453365 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2006 | B1 | EP1453365 | 24.08.2005 | A3 | EP1453365 | 01.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP99811150 | 13.12.1999 | EP04013307 | 13.12.1999 | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE29823122U | 18.02.1999 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59913640D1 | 10.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE59913640 | 13.12.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6515866 | 04.02.2003 | B2 | US2002057550 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | US78265301 | 12.02.2001 | US47004999 | 22.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE277500T | 15.10.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE332074T | 15.07.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59910580D1 | 28.10.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL133399 | 10.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL173325 | 18.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6220879 | 24.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP99810234 | 17.03.1999 | DE29823122 | 28.12.1998 | Type | Earlier application | EP1017262 |