EP1453365 - Plug-in unit with active/passive switching and lever for insertion and removal of such plug-in unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELMA Electronic AG Hofstrasse 93 8620 Wetzikon / CH | [2004/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ulrich, Daniele Leihgruebstrasse 6 8624 Grüt / CH | [2004/36] | Representative(s) | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 12 8401 Winterthur / CH | ||
Former [2004/36] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung 0067, Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 04013307.6 | 13.12.1999 | [2004/36] | Priority number, date | DE1998223122U | 28.12.1998 Original published format: DE 29823122 U | EP19990810234 | 17.03.1999 Original published format: EP 99810234 | [2004/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1453365 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1453365 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | [2005/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1453365 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
H01R13/701 (EP);
H01R12/7005 (EP);
H01R13/62933 (EP);
H05K7/1409 (EP);
H05K7/1414 (EP);
H01R13/6395 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/36] | Title | German: | Steckbaugruppe mit Aktiv-Passiv-Schaltung und Ein- und Aushebegriff für eine derartige Steckbaugruppe | [2004/39] | English: | Plug-in unit with active/passive switching and lever for insertion and removal of such plug-in unit | [2004/36] | French: | Unitè enfichable avec dispositif d' activation et de déactivation et dispositif pour insérer ou extraire une telle unité | [2004/36] |
Former [2004/36] | Stechbaugruppe mit Aktiv-Passiv-Schaltung und Ein- und Aushebegriff für eine derartige Steckbaugruppe | Examination procedure | 01.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 10.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99811150.4 / EP1017262 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | IE | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | AT | 13.12.2006 | LU | 13.12.2006 | BE | 31.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LU | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
AT | 13.12.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
BE | 31.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
IE | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 28.06.2006 | |
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0587451 (DZUS FASTENER EUROPE [GB]) [X] 1,13,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5309325 (DREHER JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5321962 (FERCHAU JOERG U [US], et al) [X] 1,13,16 * the whole document *; | [A] - LATCHES FOR EQUIPMENT DRAWERS, NTIS TECH NOTES, US DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, PAGE(S) 671, (19920901), ISSN 0889-8464, XP000322552 [A] 1 * the whole document * |