EP1604947 - Process and apparatus for producing hydrogen or ammonia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich ETH Transfer Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | For all designated states ETH Zürich ETH Transfer, Rämistrasse 101 8092 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegner, Karsten Hoeschgasse 36 8008 Zurich / CH | 02 /
Ly, Hao C. Landhusweg 3 8052 Zurich / CH | 03 /
Weiss, Rodrigo J. Treichlerstrasse 1 8032 Zurich / CH | 04 /
Pratsinis, Sotiris E. Aurorastrasse 73 8032 Zurich / CH | 05 /
Steinfeld, Aldo Reinerstrasse 30 5200 Brugg / CH | [2005/50] | Application number, filing date | 04013334.0 | 07.06.2004 | [2005/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1604947 | Date: | 14.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/10, C01B3/06, C01C1/02, C01B21/072, C01B21/06, B01J8/08 | [2005/50] | CPC: |
C01C1/02 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
B01J8/0411 (EP,US);
B01J8/0438 (EP,US);
B01J8/0492 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B13/20 (EP,US);
C01B13/34 (EP,US);
C01B21/06 (EP,US);
C01B21/072 (EP,US);
C01B3/06 (EP,US);
C01B3/105 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00849 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US);
Y02P20/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Stickstoff oder Ammoniak | [2005/50] | English: | Process and apparatus for producing hydrogen or ammonia | [2005/50] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour production d'hydrogene ou d'ammoniac | [2005/50] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/21] | 04.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5525320 (PRATSINIS SOTIRIS E [US], et al) [DA] 9-17 * claim - * * column 4, line 9 - column 5, line 53 * * figures 1,8; table 2 *; | [A]EP0847372 (INEOS ACRYLICS UK LTD [GB]) [A] 12-17 * claim 8 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0020] , [0021] ** figure 1 *; | [DA]WO02090255 (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 9-11 * claims 1-4 * * page 1, line 20 - page 3, line 18 *; | [A]US6572836 (SCHULZ ROBERT [CA], et al) [A] 1-8,12-17 * claims 1-7 * * column 1, lines 21-27 * * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 20 * * figure 3 *; | [DA] - STEINFELD A, "Solar hydrogen production via a two-step water-splitting thermochemical cycle based on Zn/ZnO redox reactions", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., BARKING, GB, (200206), vol. 27, no. 6, ISSN 0360-3199, pages 611 - 619, XP004345166 [DA] 1-8 * 1. Introduction * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0360-3199(01)00177-X |