EP1505784 - IEEE 1394-based unidirectional ring system for indoor backbone network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2007 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/37] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Do-In Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Lae-Kyoung Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Cheung, Hee-Won Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Oh, Yun-Je Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013394.4 | 07.06.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | KR20030054398 | 06.08.2003 Original published format: KR 2003054398 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505784 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505784 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/64, H04L12/42, H04L12/28 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04L12/6418 (EP,US);
H04L12/42 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/40097 (EP,US);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IEEE 1394 basiertes unidirektionales Ringsystem für Inhaus-Hauptnetzwerk | [2005/06] | English: | IEEE 1394-based unidirectional ring system for indoor backbone network | [2005/06] | French: | Système en anneau unidirectionnel utilisant IEEE 1394 pour un réseau intérieur de base | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0054077 (IBM [US]) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10,11 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 17 * * page 23, line 1 - page 26, line 15; figure 1 * [A] 4,5,8,9; | [Y]US2002021465 (MOORE RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10,11 * column A * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0033] , [0041] - [0043]; figures 1-3,5,6; claim - *; | [YA]US6597665 (VAN LOO WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7,10,11 * column A * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 7 * * column 9, line 20 - column 10, line 34; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5,8,9; | [A] - JENNINGS ROGER, "Fire on the Wire: The IEEE 1394 high performance serial bus", INTERNET CITATION, XX, XX, (19970131), pages 1 - 7, XP002087275 [A] 4-11 * the whole document * | [A] - GUSTAVSON D B, "THE SCALABLE COHERENT INTERFACE AND RELATED STANDARDS PROJECTS", IEEE MICRO, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19920201), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 0272-1732, pages 10 - 21, XP000257464 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/40.124376 |