EP1503457 - Socket for a flat male terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/05] | Socket for a flat plug | ||
[2008/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2009 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Europe Ltd. Unit 1 The Willows, Mark Road Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 7AU / GB | [2008/45] |
Former [2005/05] | For all designated states Yazaki Europe Ltd. Unit 1 The Willows, Mark Road Hemel Hempstead, Hertfordshire HP2 7AU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutsch, Harald Michael Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 41 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | 02 /
Resman, Ranko Andrilovecka 44 10000 Zagreb / HR | 03 /
Lekic, Mario 3.Savski ODV.5 10000 Zagreb-Sesvete / HR | 04 /
Petrovic-Poljak, Goran Culinecka Cesta 31 10000 Zagreb / HR | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Harwardt, Günther, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Harwardt, Günther, Dipl.-Ing., et al Harwardt Neumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Brandstrasse 10 53721 Siegburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013585.7 | 09.06.2004 | [2005/05] | Priority number, date | DE2003135196 | 30.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10335196 | [2005/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1503457 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1503457 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/115 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
H01R13/113 (EP,US);
H01R4/185 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/48] |
Former [2005/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kontaktbuchse für einen Flachstecker | [2005/05] | English: | Socket for a flat male terminal | [2008/20] | French: | Connecteur femelle pour fiche plate | [2005/05] |
Former [2005/05] | Socket for a flat plug | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 28.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2009 | [2010/38] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0352871 (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]) [DA] 1 * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 57 *; | [AD]DE29719153U (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]) |