EP1493888 - Vehicle door lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Schliesssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 42 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2006/15] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Brose Schliesssysteme GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Strasse 42 42369 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brose, Simon Südring 3 45525 Hattingen / DE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013599.8 | 09.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE20031030194 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: DE 10330194 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1493888 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1493888 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05B17/22, E05B65/32 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
E05B85/26 (EP,US);
E05B81/66 (EP,US);
E05B81/68 (EP,US);
Y10T292/1047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug-Türschloss | [2005/01] | English: | Vehicle door lock | [2005/01] | French: | Serrure de porte de véhicule automobile | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 23.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.04.2006 | CZ | 12.04.2006 | EE | 12.04.2006 | FI | 12.04.2006 | IE | 12.04.2006 | NL | 12.04.2006 | PL | 12.04.2006 | RO | 12.04.2006 | SI | 12.04.2006 | SK | 12.04.2006 | TR | 12.04.2006 | AT | 09.06.2006 | LU | 09.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 12.07.2006 | DK | 12.07.2006 | SE | 12.07.2006 | GR | 13.07.2006 | PT | 12.09.2006 | HU | 13.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
TR | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
LU | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 13.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 13.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 12.07.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
EE | 12.04.2006 | ||
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
GR | 13.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
AT | 09.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
IT | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
RO | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
NL | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 12.04.2006 | |
FI | 12.04.2006 | ||
IE | 12.04.2006 | ||
PL | 12.04.2006 | ||
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SK | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
PT | 12.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 12.07.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 12.04.2006 | |
SI | 12.04.2006 | ||
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 12.04.2006 | |
SE | 12.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 12.04.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5836639 (KLEEFELDT FRANK [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 22 - line 53; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2778939 (VALEO SECURITE HABITACLE [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE10065100 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 40 - line 58; figure . *; | [A]US6428059 (KOBAYASHI FUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 22 - line 37; figure . * |