29.01.2016 |
Refusal of application |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.10.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
05.08.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.01.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.09.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
10.09.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.09.2010 |
First examination report |
|
04.06.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.06.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] |
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] |
02.10.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
02.10.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |