Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7226882 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2007 | B2 | US2006035094 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100697399B | Global Dossier | 20.03.2007 | B1 | KR20040106235 | 17.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4907850B | Global Dossier | 04.04.2012 | B2 | JP2005022958 | 27.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1489058 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2009 | A3 | EP1489058 | 22.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1296941C | 24.01.2007 | C | CN1604236 | 06.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI250534B | 01.03.2006 | B | TW200502992 | 16.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2004128922 | 23.04.2004 | JP2003167047 | 11.06.2003 |