EP1455178 - An instrument for detecting light emission from a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BioControl Systems, Inc. 12822 SE 32nd Street Bellevue, WA 98005 / US | [2012/29] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states BioControl Systems, Inc. 12822 SE 32nd Street Bellevue, Washington 98005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feldsine, Philip T. 1621 72nd Avenue, SE Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | 02 /
Di Carlo, Joseph B. 200 Lindero Avenue Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | 03 /
Kelly, Tim A. 815 144th Place SE. Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | 04 /
Andersen, Mark 316 Filmore Street Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 05 /
Christensen, Jim 20130 NW Nestucca Portland, OR 97229 / US | 06 /
Kressner, Anita 7003 169th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | [2012/10] |
Former [2005/18] | 01 /
Feldsine, Philip T. 1621 72nd Avenue, SE Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | ||
02 /
Di Carlo, Joseph B. 200 Lindero Avenue Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | |||
03 /
Kelly, Tim A. 815 144th Place SE. Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | |||
04 /
Andersen, Mark 316 Filmore Street Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | |||
05 /
Christiansen, Jim 20130 NW Nestucca Portland, OR 97229 / US | |||
06 /
Kressner, Anita 7003 169th Avenue SE Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | |||
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
Feldsine, Philip T. 1621 72nd Avenue, SE Mercer Island, WA 98040 / US | ||
02 /
Di Carlo, Joseph B. 200 Lindero Avenue Long Beach, CA 90803 / US | |||
03 /
Kelly, Tim A. 815 144th Place SE. Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | |||
04 /
Andersen, Mark 316 Filmore Street Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | |||
05 /
Christensen, Jim 21030 NW Nestucca Portland, OR 97229 / US | |||
06 /
Kressner, Anita 16004 SE 9th Street Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | Representative(s) | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/13] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 Munich / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Hoarton, Lloyd Douglas Charles Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04013792.9 | 05.12.2002 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | US20010338844P | 06.12.2001 Original published format: US 338844 P | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455178 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455178 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455178 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/76, G01N33/53 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
B01L3/5029 (EP);
G01N21/763 (EP);
B01L2300/0672 (EP);
B01L2400/0478 (EP);
B01L2400/0683 (EP);
G01N2001/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Nachweis der Lichtemission einer Probe | [2004/37] | English: | An instrument for detecting light emission from a sample | [2004/37] | French: | Dispositif pour la détection de l'émission de la lumière d'un échantillon | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 21.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02804750.4 / EP1451560 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020804750) is 03.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.2012 | BE | 18.07.2012 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | LU | 05.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
CY | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 18.07.2012 | |
BE | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 18.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8000188 (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1 * page 7, line 12 - line 22; figure 2 * * abstract *; | [X]GB2281966 (BIOTRACE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3-7 * page 4, line 24 - line 38; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0718622 (BIO SENSOR KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,8-12* column 2, line 24 - line 37; figure 6 * |