EP1518776 - Control apparatus for an electrically driven power steering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2010/40] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city, Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Jirou Denso Corporation 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi-pref. 448-8661 / JP | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014127.7 | 16.06.2004 | [2005/13] | Priority number, date | JP20030338645 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003338645 | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1518776 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1518776 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04 | [2005/13] | CPC: |
B62D6/007 (EP,US);
B62D5/0463 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/51] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuergerät für eine elektrische Servolenkung | [2005/13] | English: | Control apparatus for an electrically driven power steering | [2005/13] | French: | Dispositif de commande pour direction assistée électrique | [2005/13] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0147539 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 9* figure 1 *; | [XA]US5925082 (SHIMIZU YASUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 53 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 5-8; | [X]JP2001151137 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0038] , [0052] , [0053] * * figures 2-4,9,10 * |