EP1536066 - Sound proofing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurovia Beton GmbH NL Teco Schallschutz Woltorfer Strasse 112 31224 Peine / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Eurovia Beton GmbH NL Teco Schallschutz Woltorfer Strasse 112 31224 Peine / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Macko, Torsten Klingenteichstrasse 1/1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Methner, Bernd Am kleinen Holz 5 38159 Vechelde / DE | 03 /
Riemann, Reinhard Erich-Heckel-Ring 9 31228 Peine / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
Macko, Torsten Klingenteichstrasse 1/1 69117 Heidelberg / DE | ||
02 /
Methner, Bernd Am kleinen Holz 5 38159 Vechelde / DE | |||
03 /
Riemann, Reinhard Ericht-Heckel-Ring 9 31228 Peine / DE | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Postfach 10 13 54 45013 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014299.4 | 18.06.2004 | [2005/22] | Priority number, date | DE20031056291 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10356291 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1536066 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1536066 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01F8/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
E01F8/0017 (EP);
E01F8/0023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Title | German: | Schallschutzelement | [2005/22] | English: | Sound proofing element | [2005/22] | French: | Elément d'isolation acoustique | [2005/22] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 01.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.05.2006 | CZ | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | GB | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | IT | 17.05.2006 | PL | 17.05.2006 | RO | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | SK | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | LU | 18.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | ES | 28.08.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | HU | 18.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
TR | 17.05.2006 | ||
LU | 18.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
HU | 18.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
GB | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | CZ | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
PL | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SK | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 17.08.2006 | |
ES | 28.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0039984 (VAPOTHERM BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document *; | [XAY]FR2551784 (ALCOA NEDERLAND BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,15 * the whole document * [A] 5,8,9 [Y] 4,12,13; | [A]DE29510861U (KOCH GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [Y]DE29911461U (JUNG THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 4,12,13 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4230786 | DE19906989 |