EP1488814 - Odourising apparatus with automatic control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aromata International GmbH Am Fichtenholz 5 87477 Sulzberg / DE | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nübling, Kurt Ludwig c/o Aromata International GmbH Am Fichtenholz 5 87477 Sulzberg / DE | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014400.8 | 18.06.2004 | [2004/52] | Priority number, date | DE2003209534U | 20.06.2003 Original published format: DE 20309534 U | [2004/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488814 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/12 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
A61L9/042 (EP);
A61L9/122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | Beduftungsgerät mit automatischer Steuerung | [2004/52] | English: | Odourising apparatus with automatic control | [2004/52] | French: | Dispositif pour odoriser avec contrôle automatique | [2004/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/33] | 08.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.12.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/07] | 03.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5302359 (NOWATZKI RAYMOND L [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 2, lines 35-63; figure 2 *; | [A]US5871562 (CULOSO RICHARD [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]US2002105099 (WARREN JACQUELINE M COLE [US]) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] *; | [X]EP1252900 (LENFANT JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0029]; figure 1 * |