EP1591095 - Apparatus for generating massage current in sanitary tub [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Kaldewei GmbH & Co. KG Beckumer Strasse 33-35 59229 Ahlen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | For all designated states Franz Kaldewei GmbH & Co.KG Beckumer Strasse 33-35 59229 Ahlen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlief, Dirk Dipl.-Ing Schützenstrasse 9 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Albrecht, Rainer Harald, et al Patentanwälte Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Theaterplatz 3 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04014411.5 | 19.06.2004 | [2005/44] | Priority number, date | DE20041021470 | 30.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004021470 | [2007/51] |
Former [2005/44] | DE2004121470 | 30.04.2004 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591095 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1591095 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61H33/00, A61H33/02 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A61H33/027 (EP,US);
A61H33/6063 (EP,US);
A61H2033/023 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Massagestromes in einer Sanitärwanne | [2005/44] | English: | Apparatus for generating massage current in sanitary tub | [2005/44] | French: | Dispositif de création de courant de massage dans une baignoire sanitaire | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 16.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.06.2008 | CZ | 04.06.2008 | EE | 04.06.2008 | FI | 04.06.2008 | IE | 04.06.2008 | PL | 04.06.2008 | RO | 04.06.2008 | SI | 04.06.2008 | SK | 04.06.2008 | TR | 04.06.2008 | LU | 19.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 04.09.2008 | SE | 04.09.2008 | GR | 05.09.2008 | PT | 04.11.2008 | HU | 05.12.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
TR | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 04.06.2008 | |
CZ | 04.06.2008 | ||
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
HU | 05.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
LU | 19.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 04.09.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
EE | 04.06.2008 | ||
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
RO | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
SK | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | CZ | 04.06.2008 | |
FI | 04.06.2008 | ||
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
PT | 04.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
IE | 04.06.2008 | ||
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
SE | 04.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 04.06.2008 | |
PL | 04.06.2008 | ||
SI | 04.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 04.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4853987 (JAWORSKI WILLIAM R [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 7, line 5; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE4413016 (SCHUESSLER GUENTER [DE]) [A] 1,7,8 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 66; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US5956784 (PERDREAU ANDRE [US], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 52 - column 7, line 16; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE19834341 |