Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1609760 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1609760



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 114
23.05.2012 Closing of application Search / examination 1
07.02.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
03.08.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
14.01.2009 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Claims Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Description Search / examination 1
17.12.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.10.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
22.07.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.07.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 Communication confirming withdrawal from representation Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.06.2008 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
30.05.2008 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
27.02.2008 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
27.02.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.11.2005 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.12.2004 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
16.12.2004 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
16.12.2004 Description Search / examination 6
06.12.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.12.2004 European search report Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.11.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
13.10.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.07.2004 Communication regarding the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 2
14.07.2004 Annex Search / examination 16
14.07.2004 Authorisation Search / examination 1
14.07.2004 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 4
14.07.2004 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
01.07.2004 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 11
23.06.2004 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
23.06.2004 Description Search / examination 6
23.06.2004 Drawings Search / examination 2
23.06.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
22.06.2004 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
22.06.2004 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 11