blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1609760

EP1609760 - Method for preparaing Iron(II) sulfate heptahydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.06.2012  [2012/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kehrmann, Alexander
Marie-Curie-Strasse 17
46509 Xanten / DE
[2005/52]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2005/52]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2008/30]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2005/52]Ksoll, Peter
Patentanwälte Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh, Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date04014637.522.06.2004
[2005/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1609760
Date:28.12.2005
Language:DE
[2005/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2004
ClassificationIPC:C01G49/14
[2005/52]
CPC:
C01G49/14 (EP,US); C01B7/035 (EP,US); C01B7/0737 (EP,US);
C23G1/36 (EP,US); Y10S423/02 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2005/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gewinnung von Eisen(II)sulfatheptahydrat[2005/52]
English:Method for preparaing Iron(II) sulfate heptahydrate[2005/52]
French:Procédé de préparation de sulfate de fer(II) heptahydraté[2005/52]
Examination procedure16.12.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/52]
27.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.12.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/26]
07.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.02.2008
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
17.12.2008Request for further processing filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
03.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
25.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201108   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS52130497  ;
 [A]GB910356  (FAKLER & CIE O) [A] 1 * page 1, line 17 - line 47 *;
 [XA]DE1546076  (ALLIED CHEM) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 4 * * page 10, line 20 - page 13, line 7 * [A] 4-8;
 [A]DE1621609  (K S F CHEMICAL PROCESSES LTD) [A] 1-8 * page 4, line 26 - page 11, line 25 *;
 [DA]US5417955  (CONNOLLY DAVID W [US]) [DA] 5-8* the whole document *;
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 50, Database accession no. 1977-88946Y, XP002307420 & JPS52130497 A 19771101 (TOYO KOHAN CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * abstract *
by applicantUS5417955
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.