EP1491815 - Vehicle lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hella KGaA Hueck & Co. Rixbecker Strasse 75 59552 Lippstadt / DE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henneböhle, Klaus Bergwinkel 12 33142 Büren / DE | [2005/01] | Application number, filing date | 04014811.6 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/01] | Priority number, date | DE2003128216 | 24.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10328216 | [2005/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1491815 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1491815 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1491815 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F21S8/10, F21V8/00, B60Q3/02, F21Y101/02, F21W101/00, // F21Y101/02, F21W101/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G02B6/001 (EP,US);
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21S43/237 (EP);
F21S43/245 (EP);
F21S43/247 (EP);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | F21S8/10, F21V8/00, B60Q3/02, F21Y101/02, F21W101/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Title | German: | Beleuchtungseinrichtung für ein Fahrzeug | [2005/01] | English: | Vehicle lighting device | [2005/01] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour véhicule | [2005/01] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 21.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.03.2010 | CZ | 03.03.2010 | DK | 03.03.2010 | EE | 03.03.2010 | FI | 03.03.2010 | IE | 03.03.2010 | IT | 03.03.2010 | NL | 03.03.2010 | PL | 03.03.2010 | RO | 03.03.2010 | SE | 03.03.2010 | SI | 03.03.2010 | SK | 03.03.2010 | TR | 03.03.2010 | BG | 03.06.2010 | GR | 04.06.2010 | ES | 14.06.2010 | AT | 24.06.2010 | LU | 24.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | PT | 05.07.2010 | HU | 04.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
AT | 24.06.2010 | ||
LU | 24.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
AT | 24.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
HU | 04.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
AT | 24.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
IT | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 05.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
DK | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
BG | 03.06.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 03.03.2010 | |
CZ | 03.03.2010 | ||
EE | 03.03.2010 | ||
FI | 03.03.2010 | ||
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
RO | 03.03.2010 | ||
SE | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
SK | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
IE | 03.03.2010 | ||
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
GR | 04.06.2010 | ||
ES | 14.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
NL | 03.03.2010 | ||
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 03.03.2010 | |
PL | 03.03.2010 | ||
SI | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 03.03.2010 | |
SI | 03.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8712678U (PREH, ELEKTROFEINMECHANISCHE WERKE JAKOB PREH NACHF. GMBH & CO, 8740 B) [A] 1 * page 11, line 21; claim 27 ** figure 4 *; | [AD]DE19804440 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 30 - line 62 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19850443 (VALEO BELEUCHTUNG DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] * * figure 4 * | by applicant | DE19804440 | DE20019073U |