EP1610002 - Saturation-proof hydraulic control device with two or more elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walvoil S.p.A. Via Adige, 13/D 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2005/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busani, Ulderico Via Simone Martini, 17 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2005/52] | Representative(s) | Guareschi, Antonella Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Via Mazzini 2 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Guareschi, Antonella Ing. Dallaglio S.r.l. Viale Mentana 92/C 43100 Parma / IT | ||
Former [2005/52] | Guareschi, Antonella Studio Ing. Fabrizio Dallaglio, 92/C, Viale Mentana 43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 04014821.5 | 24.06.2004 | [2005/52] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1610002 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1610002 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/16, F15B13/04 | [2005/52] | CPC: |
F15B11/165 (EP,US);
F15B11/163 (EP,US);
F15B13/0417 (EP,US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP,US);
F15B2211/30555 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3111 (EP,US);
F15B2211/3144 (EP,US);
F15B2211/31576 (EP,US);
F15B2211/6051 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/52] | Title | German: | Load-sensing-Hydrauliksystem mit mehreren Sektionen | [2005/52] | English: | Saturation-proof hydraulic control device with two or more elements | [2005/52] | French: | Système hydraulique à détection de charge avec plusieures sections | [2005/52] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/52] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.04.2008 | BE | 02.04.2008 | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | NL | 02.04.2008 | PL | 02.04.2008 | RO | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | IE | 24.06.2008 | LU | 24.06.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | ES | 13.07.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/38] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CY | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 24.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
BE | 02.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
RO | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
NL | 02.04.2008 | ||
PL | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 02.04.2008 | |
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
ES | 13.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4719753 (KROPP WALTER [DE]); | [A]US4986071 (VOSS DENNIS A [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 9; figure . *; | [AD]US5715865 (WILKE RAUD A [US]) [AD] 1,4 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 26; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9813604 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 25; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5806312 (KAUSS WOLFGANG [FR], et al) [AD] 1,4 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [AD]US5890362 (WILKE RAUD A [US]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 7, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003121256 (MATHER DANIEL T [US]) [A] 1,4 * paragraphs [0013] - [0021]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4719753 | US5715865 | US5890362 |